This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 13:10:06 (UTC).

SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES, LLC VS WAYNE W LU

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WAYNE W LU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7977

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC

Defendant

LU WAYNE W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AFZALNIA AFSANEH

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/15/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/15/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Re: Venue

12/15/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Re: Venue

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/15/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service

1/20/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2023
  • Hearing12/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service; Filed by: Security Credit Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Security Credit Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Wayne W Lu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Security Credit Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Wayne W Lu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration Re: Venue; Filed by: Security Credit Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Wayne W Lu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Security Credit Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Wayne W Lu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less