This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 17:36:36 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK VS SHANNON KRAUS

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHANNON KRAUS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6123

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECOND ROUND SUB LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK

Defendant

KRAUS SHANNON

Sunland, CA 91040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

11/21/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/21/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/21/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

12/28/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2023
  • Hearing11/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC as assignee of comenity bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC as assignee of comenity bank (Plaintiff); As to: SHANNON KRAUS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC as assignee of comenity bank (Plaintiff); As to: SHANNON KRAUS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC as assignee of comenity bank (Plaintiff); As to: SHANNON KRAUS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECOND ROUND SUB LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK J.CREW is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard