This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2022 at 03:59:02 (UTC).

SEAN XIE, MD A MEDICAL CORPORATION VS BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 SEAN XIE, MD A MEDICAL CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1320

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEAN XIE MD A MEDICAL CORPORATION

Defendant

BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

8/19/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/19/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

8/19/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/30/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/16/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - Notice Declaration of Non Service

9/2/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice Declaration of Non Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Amy Wylie

10/18/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Amy Wylie

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/20/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

9/16/2021: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/27/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Sean Xie

10/26/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Sean Xie

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/26/2021

10/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/26/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/26/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Aldo Dizon/Senior Claim Compliance Analyst

10/13/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Aldo Dizon/Senior Claim Compliance Analyst

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Sean Xie; Filed by: Sean Xie, MD a Medical Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Sean Xie, MD a Medical Corporation against Defendant Blue Shield of California Promise Health Plan on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sean Xie, MD a Medical Corporation on 08/19/2021 for the principal amount of $1,935.01 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $1,985.01.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/26/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/26/2021 at 01:30 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 10/26/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Blue Shield of California Promise Health Plan (Defendant); As to: Sean Xie, MD a Medical Corporation (Plaintiff); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Amy Wylie; Filed by: Blue Shield of California Promise Health Plan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Aldo Dizon/Senior Claim Compliance Analyst; Filed by: Blue Shield of California Promise Health Plan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Sean Xie, MD a Medical Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Blue Shield of California Promise Health Plan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Sean Xie, MD a Medical Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Blue Shield of California Promise Health Plan (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice Declaration of Non Service; Filed by: Sean Xie, MD a Medical Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Blue Shield of California Promise Health Plan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Sean Xie, MD a Medical Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Blue Shield of California Promise Health Plan (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sean Xie, MD a Medical Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Blue Shield of California Promise Health Plan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/26/2021 at 01:30 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN A NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION AKA CARE1ST PARTNER PLAN INC. is a litigant