This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2022 at 00:07:53 (UTC).

SBS TRUST DEED NETWORK, INC VS CASTLES KILLARNEY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 SBS TRUST DEED NETWORK, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CASTLES KILLARNEY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0311

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SBS TRUST DEED NETWORK INC

Defendant

CASTLES KILLARNEY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

2/15/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

2/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/15/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

2/15/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR) - Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR)

4/13/2022: Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR) - Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by SBS Trust Deed Network, Inc on 02/15/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by SBS Trust Deed Network, Inc as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR); Filed by: SBS Trust Deed Network, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Castles Killarney Owners Association Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SBS Trust Deed Network, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Castles Killarney Owners Association Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/01/2022; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: SBS Trust Deed Network, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Castles Killarney Owners Association Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.B.S. TRUST DEED NETWORK is a litigant