This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 21:05:25 (UTC).

S.B.S LIEN SERVICES VS HASLEY HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 S B S LIEN SERVICES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HASLEY HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0734

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIELS EDWARD

Defendants

S.B.S. LIEN SERVICES

HASLEY HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Edward Daniels against Defendant Hasley Hills Homeowners Assoc on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Edward Daniels on 06/28/2021 for the principal amount of $4,900.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $4,950.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketOn the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Edward Daniels on 06/28/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to S.B.S. Lien Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/10/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/10/2021 at 01:30 PM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 09/10/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/13/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 01:30 PM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09/10/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/10/2021 at 01:30 PM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: S.B.S Lien Services (Plaintiff); As to: Hasley Hills Homeowners Assoc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 01:30 PM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Edward Daniels (Plaintiff); As to: S.B.S. Lien Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SBS LIEN SERVICES is a litigant