This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2021 at 08:33:46 (UTC).

SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC., AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION VS ARTEMIO A. GONZALEZ FUENTES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC , AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARTEMIO A GONZALEZ FUENTES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4204

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES A CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENTAL AGENCY

CERRITOS AUTO BODY INC. A CORPORATION

FUENTES ARTEMIO A. GONZALEZ AKA ARTEMIO A. G. FUENTES AKA ARTEMIO A. FUENTES AKA ARTEMIO GONZALEZ FUENTES AKA ARTEMIO G. FUENTES AKA ARTEMIO FUENTES AN INDIVIDUAL

PATEL INDIVIDUALLY RAJESH DBA CERRITOS AUTO BODY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRUGLIAK BENTZION

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/21/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BY AND OF MONETARY RECOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANT CAL

7/16/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BY AND OF MONETARY RECOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANT CAL

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

6/25/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

6/25/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

6/25/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

6/25/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

6/25/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

6/25/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

6/25/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

6/25/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) - Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/25/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

6/1/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/1/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketHearing on Application for Writ of Possession (CCP 512.010) scheduled for 09/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 85 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Santander Consumer USA Inc., an Illinois Corporation on 06/01/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Santander Consumer USA Inc., an Illinois Corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BY AND OF MONETARY RECOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES: Filed By: Santander Consumer USA Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketHearing on Application for Writ of Possession (CCP 512.010) scheduled for 09/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030); Filed by: Santander Consumer USA Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030); Filed by: Santander Consumer USA Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by: Santander Consumer USA Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Artemio A. Gonzalez Fuentes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by: Santander Consumer USA Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Cerritos Auto Body Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030); Filed by: Santander Consumer USA Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by: Santander Consumer USA Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: California Department of Motor Vehicles, a California Governmental Agency (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Santander Consumer USA Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: California Department of Motor Vehicles, a California Governmental Agency (Defendant); Service Date: 06/02/2021; Service Cost: 133.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Santander Consumer USA Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Artemio A. Gonzalez Fuentes (Defendant); Cerritos Auto Body Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Rajesh Patel, individually (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Santander Consumer USA Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Artemio A. Gonzalez Fuentes (Defendant); Cerritos Auto Body Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Rajesh Patel, individually (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Santander Consumer USA Inc., an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Artemio A. Gonzalez Fuentes (Defendant); Cerritos Auto Body Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Rajesh Patel, individually (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES is a litigant

Latest cases where SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION DBA CHRYSLER CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Patel is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRUGLIAK BENTZION