This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2022 at 06:05:40 (UTC).

SALVADOR MENDOZA VS PAYTON MAXENE JOHNSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 SALVADOR MENDOZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PAYTON MAXENE JOHNSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3082

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDOZA SALVADOR

Defendants

JOHNSON PAYTON MAXENE

ST. CLAIR LINCOLN STANLEY

EAN HOLDINGS LLC A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ VENTURA IVAN M

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

5/3/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

5/3/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/3/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

5/3/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

5/3/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2025
  • Hearing05/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2023
  • Hearing10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SALVADOR MENDOZA (Plaintiff); As to: PAYTON MAXENE JOHNSON (Defendant); LINCOLN STANLEY ST. CLAIR (Defendant); EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SALVADOR MENDOZA (Plaintiff); As to: PAYTON MAXENE JOHNSON (Defendant); LINCOLN STANLEY ST. CLAIR (Defendant); EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SALVADOR MENDOZA (Plaintiff); As to: PAYTON MAXENE JOHNSON (Defendant); LINCOLN STANLEY ST. CLAIR (Defendant); EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOPEZ VENTURA IVAN M.