This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/31/2021 at 08:35:45 (UTC).

SAHAG NALBANDIAN VS JORGE A. MANRIQUE

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 SAHAG NALBANDIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JORGE A MANRIQUE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1891

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NALBANDIAN SAHAG

Defendant

MANRIQUE JORGE A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANOUKIAN NIGOL

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/4/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/4/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/4/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/4/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2024
  • Hearing03/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • Hearing09/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sahag Nalbandian (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge A. Manrique (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Sahag Nalbandian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sahag Nalbandian (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge A. Manrique (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sahag Nalbandian (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge A. Manrique (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sahag Nalbandian (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge A. Manrique (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sahag Nalbandian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANOUKIAN NIGOL. ESQ.