This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 20:36:53 (UTC).

SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY VS ALFONSO A. ROJAS

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALFONSO A ROJAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8200

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

ROJAS ALFONSO A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/16/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/16/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/16/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/16/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2024
  • Hearing11/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • Hearing05/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Safeway Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Alfonso A. Rojas (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/15/2021; Service Cost: 67.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Safeway Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Alfonso A. Rojas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Safeway Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Alfonso A. Rojas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Safeway Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Alfonso A. Rojas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M