This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2021 at 07:07:27 (UTC).

RUIWEI LI VS AUTOMAX MOTOR GROUP INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 RUIWEI LI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AUTOMAX MOTOR GROUP INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4173

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LI RUIWEI

Defendants

CHEN ZEHUI

AUTOMAX MOTOR GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEROPIAN EDISSON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/28/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

5/28/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/28/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2024
  • Hearing05/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ruiwei Li (Plaintiff); As to: Automax Motor Group Inc. (Defendant); Zehui Chen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ruiwei Li (Plaintiff); As to: Automax Motor Group Inc. (Defendant); Zehui Chen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ruiwei Li (Plaintiff); As to: Automax Motor Group Inc. (Defendant); Zehui Chen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ruiwei Li (Plaintiff); As to: Automax Motor Group Inc. (Defendant); Zehui Chen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTOMAX MOTOR GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seropian, Eddison