This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 12:16:15 (UTC).

ROY CHANG VS CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 ROY CHANG filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5293

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHANG ROY

Defendant

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BONTRAGER NICHOLAS J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

7/20/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7/20/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/20/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/20/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/20/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/20/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Roy Chang on 07/20/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Roy Chang as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketAddress for Nicholas J Bontrager (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Roy Chang (Plaintiff); As to: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Roy Chang (Plaintiff); As to: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Roy Chang (Plaintiff); As to: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BONTRAGER NICHOLAS J.