This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 08:04:45 (UTC).

ROSA MORENO HENRIQUEZ VS ARMANI SNEED

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 ROSA MORENO HENRIQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARMANI SNEED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7393

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO HENRIQUEZ ROSA

Defendant

SNEED ARMANI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEONARD WILLIAM SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

KOTHARY PRITESH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/12/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/12/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/12/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/12/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/12/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

General Denial - General Denial

12/23/2021: General Denial - General Denial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/13/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: Armani Sneed (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Armani Sneed (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Rosa Moreno Henriquez on 10/12/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Rosa Moreno Henriquez as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- William Scott Leonard (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Law Offices of William S. Leonard, APLC to Law Offices of William S Leonard. APLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketAddress for William Scott Leonard (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rosa Moreno Henriquez (Plaintiff); As to: Armani Sneed (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Rosa Moreno Henriquez (Plaintiff); As to: Armani Sneed (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rosa Moreno Henriquez (Plaintiff); As to: Armani Sneed (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOTHARY PRITESH