This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 02:25:09 (UTC).

ROBYN CHACONAS VS OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 ROBYN CHACONAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EMMA CASTRO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2512

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EMMA CASTRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHACONAS ROBYN

Defendants

OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

BERTOLONE JR RONALD MARK

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

7/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

7/1/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/1/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

7/1/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

8/25/2022: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department

8/11/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/30/2022

8/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/30/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/30/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/30/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Robyn Chaconas on 07/01/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 08/30/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection (this notice of rejection is placed in the cart outside of room 102): Name Extension changed from this notice of rejection is placed in the cart outside of room 102 to (this notice of rejection is placed in the cart outside of room 102); As To Parties changed from Robyn Chaconas (Plaintiff) to Robyn Chaconas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Robyn Chaconas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection this notice of rejection is placed in the cart outside of room 102: Name Extension: this notice of rejection is placed in the cart outside of room 102; As To Parties changed from Robyn Chaconas (Plaintiff) to Robyn Chaconas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department; Filed by: Robyn Chaconas (Plaintiff); As to: Otis Elevator Company (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Robyn Chaconas (Plaintiff); As to: Otis Elevator Company (Defendant); Ronald Mark Bertolone Jr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Emma Castro in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Otis Elevator Company is a litigant