Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 00:02:42 (UTC).

ROBERT J. RAZNICK VS MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 ROBERT J RAZNICK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1033

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAZNICK ROBERT J.

Defendant

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/23/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

5/24/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence

5/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/24/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/24/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2021 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Robert J. Raznick on 05/24/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Robert J. Raznick as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Robert J. Raznick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Mercury Insurance Company (Defendant) to Mercury Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08/09/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Robert J. Raznick (Plaintiff); As to: Mercury Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant