This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 12:41:25 (UTC).

ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC VS BENSOLEIMANI.COM, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BENSOLEIMANI COM, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4170

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC

Defendant

BENSOLEIMANI.COM INC. A CORPORATION AKA BEN SOLEIMANI AKA BENSOLEIMANI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINASSIAN NATALIA

Defendant Attorney

DAVIDOFF RICHARD C

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/23/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/23/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/23/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

4/11/2022: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Answer - Answer

4/11/2022: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • Hearing03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Bensoleimani.com, Inc., a Corporation (Defendant); As to: Robert Half International Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Bernie C. LaForteza in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Robert Half International Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Bensoleimani.com, Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Robert Half International Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Bensoleimani.com, Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robert Half International Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Bensoleimani.com, Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BENSOLEIMANI.COM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA ROBERT HALF FINANCE & ACCOUNTING is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIDOFF RICHARD C