This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 06:50:10 (UTC).

ROBERT BEST VS TMP GAS AND FOOD MART, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 ROBERT BEST filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TMP GAS AND FOOD MART. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0050

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEST ROBERT

Defendants

TMP CORP

TMP GAS AND FOOD MART

TMP CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SONNTAG ALBERT

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/5/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/5/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

1/5/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/5/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Hearing07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Robert Best (Plaintiff); As to: Tmp Gas and Food Mart (Defendant); Tmp Corporation (Defendant); Tmp Corp (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robert Best (Plaintiff); As to: Tmp Gas and Food Mart (Defendant); Tmp Corporation (Defendant); Tmp Corp (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Robert Best (Plaintiff); As to: Tmp Gas and Food Mart (Defendant); Tmp Corporation (Defendant); Tmp Corp (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Robert Best (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Robert Best (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONSTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SONNTAG, ALBERT R