This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 08:43:25 (UTC).

RIO HONDO HEALTHCARE, INC. VS KAREN SMITH, M.D., M.P.H., DIRECTOR OF THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 RIO HONDO HEALTHCARE, INC filed an Other lawsuit against KAREN SMITH, M D , M P H , DIRECTOR OF THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7842

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIO HONDO HEALTHCARE INC. DBA DOWNEY POST ACUTE

Defendants

KAREN SMITH M.D. M.P.H. DIRECTOR OF THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

DOES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGILL ASHLEY S.

Defendant Attorney

PARKER ALYSON

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/2/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/2/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

11/2/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/2/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/2/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

General Denial - General Denial

12/13/2021: General Denial - General Denial

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2024
  • Hearing11/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • Hearing05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: KAREN SMITH, M.D., M.P.H., Director of the California Department of Public Health (Defendant); THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: RIO HONDO HEALTHCARE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: KAREN SMITH, M.D., M.P.H., Director of the California Department of Public Health (Defendant); THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); Service Cost: 32.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: RIO HONDO HEALTHCARE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: KAREN SMITH, M.D., M.P.H., Director of the California Department of Public Health (Defendant); THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); Service Cost: 32.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RIO HONDO HEALTHCARE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RIO HONDO HEALTHCARE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: KAREN SMITH, M.D., M.P.H., Director of the California Department of Public Health (Defendant); THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); DOES 1 through 20, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RIO HONDO HEALTHCARE, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: KAREN SMITH, M.D., M.P.H., Director of the California Department of Public Health (Defendant); THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); DOES 1 through 20, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER ALYSON