This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 11:11:26 (UTC).

RILLAR MCDANIEL VS ACCESS SERVICES, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY DESIGNATED AS (CTSA), ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 RILLAR MCDANIEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ACCESS SERVICES, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY DESIGNATED AS CTSA . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2451

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCDANIEL RILLAR

Defendants

ACCESS SERVICES A GOVERNMENT ENTITY DESIGNATED AS CTSA

GLOBAL PARATRANSIT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MELCHOR JONATHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HADDAD HENRY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/11/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

4/11/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

4/11/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

4/11/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

4/11/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2025
  • Hearing04/14/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2023
  • Hearing10/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Rillar McDaniel (Plaintiff); As to: Access Services, a government entity designated as (CTSA) (Defendant); Global Paratransit, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Jonathan Melchor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rillar McDaniel (Plaintiff); As to: Access Services, a government entity designated as (CTSA) (Defendant); Global Paratransit, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Jonathan Melchor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rillar McDaniel (Plaintiff); As to: Access Services, a government entity designated as (CTSA) (Defendant); Global Paratransit, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Jonathan Melchor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/14/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLOBAL PARATRANSIT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ACCESS SERVICES is a litigant