This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2022 at 17:22:32 (UTC).

RAYMOND WADE VS CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 RAYMOND WADE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1971

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WADE RAYMOND

Defendant

CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence

9/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/22/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

9/22/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

9/22/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Tony Parker appearing for

11/17/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Tony Parker appearing for

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/17/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/17/2021

11/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/17/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/11/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/11/2022

1/11/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/11/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/11/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Raymond Wade on 09/22/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/17/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/11/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Tony Parker appearing for; Filed by: Capital Auto Financial, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Raymond Wade (Plaintiff); As to: Capital Auto Financial, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/12/2021; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Raymond Wade (Plaintiff); As to: Capital Auto Financial, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant