This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 00:57:49 (UTC).

RANDSTAD VS RKS OFF-ROAD LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 RANDSTAD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RKS OFF-ROAD LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0143

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RANDSTAD

Defendant

RKS OFF-ROAD LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRODKIN ALAN L

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/14/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/14/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/14/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Pre-Judgment Interest

10/31/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Pre-Judgment Interest

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/31/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/31/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

10/31/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees - Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees

10/31/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees - Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees

Judgment - Default Judgment

11/4/2022: Judgment - Default Judgment

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

11/14/2022: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • Hearing02/17/2023 at 08:31 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by: RANDSTAD (Plaintiff); As to: RKS OFF-ROAD LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 08:31 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff RANDSTAD against Defendant RKS OFF-ROAD LLC, a California limited liability company on the Complaint filed by RANDSTAD on 09/14/2022 for damages of $21,069.20, attorney fees of $1,022.08, interest of $2,724.57, and costs of $528.00 for a total of $25,343.85.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: RANDSTAD (Plaintiff); As to: RKS OFF-ROAD LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: RANDSTAD (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees; Filed by: RANDSTAD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: RANDSTAD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: RANDSTAD (Plaintiff); As to: RKS OFF-ROAD LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: RANDSTAD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: RANDSTAD (Plaintiff); As to: RKS OFF-ROAD LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 09/20/2022; Service Cost: 158.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RANDSTAD (Plaintiff); As to: RKS OFF-ROAD LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RANDSTAD (Plaintiff); As to: RKS OFF-ROAD LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RANDSTAD (Plaintiff); As to: RKS OFF-ROAD LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less