This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2022 at 03:12:33 (UTC).

RAMCO DEMOLITION, INC. VS JOHN YI

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 RAMCO DEMOLITION, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOHN YI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0093

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMCO DEMOLITION INC.

Defendant

YI JOHN

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) SASE

1/24/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) SASE

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/24/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/24/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/24/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/28/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/28/2022

3/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/28/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 03/28/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ramco Demolition, Inc. on 01/24/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/28/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ramco Demolition, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: John Yi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) SASE; Filed by: Ramco Demolition, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAMCO DEMOLITION INC is a litigant