This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2022 at 17:02:58 (UTC).

RAMCO DEMOLITION INC VS INTERKLINE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 RAMCO DEMOLITION INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INTERKLINE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EMMA CASTRO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3517

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EMMA CASTRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMCO DEMOLITION INC

Defendants

INTERKLINE LLC

NAVARRO DANNY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence

9/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/21/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/21/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

9/21/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

9/21/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/28/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/17/2021

11/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/17/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/17/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/19/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/19/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/19/2022

1/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/19/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Ramco Demolition Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/19/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ramco Demolition Inc on 09/21/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 01/19/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/17/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/19/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Ramco Demolition Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Danny Navarro (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ramco Demolition Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Interkline, LLC (Defendant); Danny Navarro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Emma Castro in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Ramco Demolition Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAMCO DEMOLITION INC is a litigant