This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 14:47:02 (UTC).

RAFAEL ARROYO, JR. VS RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, AN OHIO CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 RAFAEL ARROYO, JR filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, AN OHIO CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4920

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARROYO JR. RAFAEL

Defendants

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY AN OHIO CORPORATION

ALPHA BETA COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE

Defendant Attorney

CHILLEEN MICHAEL J.

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

7/26/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/6/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

7/6/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/6/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7/6/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

7/6/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2024
  • Hearing07/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Hearing01/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rafael Arroyo, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Ralphs Grocery Company, an Ohio Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 07/09/2021; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ralphs Grocery Company, an Ohio Corporation (Defendant); Alpha Beta Company, a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Rafael Arroyo, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rafael Arroyo, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Ralphs Grocery Company, an Ohio Corporation (Defendant); Alpha Beta Company, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Rafael Arroyo, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Ralphs Grocery Company, an Ohio Corporation (Defendant); Alpha Beta Company, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rafael Arroyo, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Ralphs Grocery Company, an Ohio Corporation (Defendant); Alpha Beta Company, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALPHA BETA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHILLEEN MICHAEL