This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 02:05:56 (UTC).

QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP. VS JOHN COUGHLAN

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN COUGHLAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1084

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

Defendant

COUGHLAN JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

POLICAR RAY

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

4/12/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

4/12/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

1/12/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/12/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/12/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2024
  • Hearing02/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: John Coughlan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff); As to: John Coughlan (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/15/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff); As to: John Coughlan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff); As to: John Coughlan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff); As to: John Coughlan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLICAR RAY