This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 18:41:02 (UTC).

QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP. VS ISMAEL CAMACHO TORRES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ISMAEL CAMACHO TORRES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1411

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC. A CALIF. CORP.

Defendants

TORRES ISMAEL CAMACHO

TORRES CONSTRUCTION CORP. A CALIF. CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

POLICAR RAY

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

4/22/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Brief (name extension) - Brief Brief Summary of the Case

4/9/2021: Brief (name extension) - Brief Brief Summary of the Case

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

4/9/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/9/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Judgment .

4/16/2021: Judgment - Judgment .

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

4/22/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/14/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

1/14/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/14/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): As To Parties changed from Ismael Camacho Torres (Defendant), Torres Construction Corp., a Calif. corp. (Defendant) to Ismael Camacho Torres (Defendant), Torres Construction Corp., a Calif. corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): As To Parties changed from Ismael Camacho Torres (Defendant), Torres Construction Corp., a Calif. corp. (Defendant) to Torres Construction Corp., a Calif. corp. (Defendant), Ismael Camacho Torres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a Calif. corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Ismael Camacho Torres (Defendant); Torres Construction Corp., a Calif. corp. (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a Calif. corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment .: Filed By: Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a Calif. corp. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a Calif. corp. against Defendant Ismael Camacho Torres and Defendant Torres Construction Corp., a Calif. corp. on the Complaint filed by Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. on 01/14/2021 for the principal amount of $12,965.11 and costs of $370.00 for a total of $13,335.11, joint and several.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment .: Status Date changed from 04/09/2021 to 04/16/2021; Result Date changed from 04/16/2021 to 04/16/2021; As To Parties changed from Ismael Camacho Torres (Defendant), Torres Construction Corp., a Calif. corp. (Defendant) to Ismael Camacho Torres (Defendant), Torres Construction Corp., a Calif. corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a Calif. corp. (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. to Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a Calif. corp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketBrief Brief Summary of the Case; Filed by: Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a Calif. corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Ismael Camacho Torres; Torres Construction Corp., a Calif. corp. On the Complaint filed by Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. on 01/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a Calif. corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Ismael Camacho Torres (Defendant); Torres Construction Corp., a Calif. corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Ismael Camacho Torres (Defendant); Torres Construction Corp., a Calif. corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Ismael Camacho Torres (Defendant); Torres Construction Corp., a Calif. corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Ismael Camacho Torres (Defendant); Torres Construction Corp., a Calif. corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORRES CONSTRUCTION CORP. A CALIF. CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLICAR RAY