Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 17:17:09 (UTC).

QIN TAN VS WALMART, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 QIN TAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2515

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAN QIN

Defendant

WALMART INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANG GRACE LEA

Defendant Attorney

HOOKER VANESSA M.

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

5/5/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

5/5/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/29/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/29/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/29/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2024
  • Hearing04/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: WALMART, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: WALMART, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: QIN TAN (Plaintiff); As to: WALMART, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 04/05/2021; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: QIN TAN (Plaintiff); As to: WALMART, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: QIN TAN (Plaintiff); As to: WALMART, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: QIN TAN (Plaintiff); As to: WALMART, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOOKER VANESSA M.