This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 20:07:41 (UTC).

PUENTE PARTNERS, LLC VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 PUENTE PARTNERS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1607

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PUENTE PARTNERS LLC DBA VICTORIA CARE CENTER

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

ARAGON MD DRPH DIRECTOR OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH TOMAS J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON MARK A.

Defendant Attorney

PARKER ALYSON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

3/10/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

3/10/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/10/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/10/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

3/10/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

General Denial - General Denial

4/21/2022: General Denial - General Denial

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2025
  • Hearing03/13/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • Hearing09/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: PUENTE PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); TOMAS J. ARAGON, MD, DRPH, DIRECTOR OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); Service Date: 03/23/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: PUENTE PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); TOMAS J. ARAGON, MD, DRPH, DIRECTOR OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); Service Date: 03/23/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PUENTE PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); TOMAS J. ARAGON, MD, DRPH, DIRECTOR OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PUENTE PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); TOMAS J. ARAGON, MD, DRPH, DIRECTOR OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PUENTE PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); TOMAS J. ARAGON, MD, DRPH, DIRECTOR OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/13/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PUENTE PARTNERS LLC DBA VICTORIA CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ARAGON MD DRPH DIRECTOR OF THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH TOMAS J is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER ALYSON