This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/12/2022 at 19:42:59 (UTC).

PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, A CORPORATION VS ALEXANDRIA ALLEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ALEXANDRIA ALLEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0267

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD A CORPORATION

Defendants

ALLEN ALEXANDRIA

SPURLOCK THEODORE III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD F.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

1/14/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

1/14/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

1/14/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/14/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

1/14/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/15/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/21/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2025
  • Hearing01/17/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • Hearing07/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ALEXANDRIA ALLEN (Defendant); THEODORE SPURLOCK, III (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to ALEXANDRIA ALLEN; THEODORE SPURLOCK, III; On the Complaint filed by PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, a corporation on 01/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: THEODORE SPURLOCK, III (Defendant); Service Date: 01/30/2022; Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ALEXANDRIA ALLEN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/02/2022; Service Cost: 80.76; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ALEXANDRIA ALLEN (Defendant); THEODORE SPURLOCK, III (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ALEXANDRIA ALLEN (Defendant); THEODORE SPURLOCK, III (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ALEXANDRIA ALLEN (Defendant); THEODORE SPURLOCK, III (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/17/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartfor is a litigant