Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 11:54:35 (UTC).

PROJECT WORKS LLC VS OSI OPTOELECTRONICS

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 PROJECT WORKS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OSI OPTOELECTRONICS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0110

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROJECT WORKS LLC DBA ENVIRONMENTAL MANAGEMENT

Defendants

OSI OPTOELECTRONICS

OSI OPTOELECTRONICS INC

 

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/24/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name) (Amended)

3/24/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name) (Amended)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

3/30/2021: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

3/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

3/30/2021: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer]

3/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer]

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

3/16/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

3/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)]

1/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • Hearing05/07/2021 at 03:00 PM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): As To Parties changed from OSI OPTOELECTRONICS (Defendant) to OSI OPTOELECTRONICS INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): As To Parties changed from OSI OPTOELECTRONICS (Defendant) to OSI OPTOELECTRONICS INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- OSI OPTOELECTRONICS INC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from OSI OPTOELECTRONICS to OSI OPTOELECTRONICS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/23/2021 at 03:00 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 05/07/2021 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: PROJECT WORKS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: OSI OPTOELECTRONICS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: PROJECT WORKS LLC (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: PROJECT WORKS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice Notice of remote appearance and exchange and submission of evidence protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: PROJECT WORKS LLC (Plaintiff); OSI OPTOELECTRONICS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: PROJECT WORKS LLC (Plaintiff); OSI OPTOELECTRONICS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/23/2021 at 03:00 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: PROJECT WORKS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: OSI OPTOELECTRONICS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: PROJECT WORKS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: OSI OPTOELECTRONICS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROJECT WORKS LLC DBA ENVIRONMENTAL MANAGEMENT is a litigant