This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2022 at 20:01:58 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY VS DAVID A. PADILLA

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID A PADILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7448

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

PADILLA DAVID A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIVINSKUS MARK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/14/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/14/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/14/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/14/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/14/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

10/14/2021: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2024
  • Hearing10/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • Hearing04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Progressive West Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: David A. Padilla (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/26/2021; Service Cost: 84.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Progressive West Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: David A. Padilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Progressive West Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: David A. Padilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Progressive West Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: David A. Padilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Progressive West Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: David A. Padilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIVINSKUS MARK ROBERT