This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 01:27:27 (UTC).

PREFERRED TOWING SERVICE, LLC VS DAISY GARCIA

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 PREFERRED TOWING SERVICE, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAISY GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0509

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PREFERRED TOWING SERVICE LLC

Defendant

GARCIA DAISY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Request to Make Payments)

12/15/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Request to Make Payments)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amended)

12/15/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amended)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Request to Make Payments) of 12/15/2022

12/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Request to Make Payments) of 12/15/2022

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/30/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

10/24/2022: Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

10/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) - Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

9/22/2022: Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) - Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

9/26/2022: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

9/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

9/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/30/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

8/30/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/30/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/30/2022

8/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/30/2022

Correspondence - Correspondence Brief in Support of Small Claim

8/3/2022: Correspondence - Correspondence Brief in Support of Small Claim

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment amended on 12/15/2022 ; Status Date changed from 08/30/2022 to 12/15/2022 ; Installment Amount: 400.00 ; Installment Start Date: 01/30/2023 ; Installment Frequency: Month ; Installment Day: 30th ; Status changed from Entered to Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Request to Make Payments)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Request to Make Payments) of 12/15/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketHearing on Request to Make Payments scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 updated: Result Date to 12/15/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Daisy Garcia (Defendant) to Daisy Garcia (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketHearing on Request to Make Payments scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Daisy Garcia (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Make Payments (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Preferred Towing Service, LLC (Plaintiff) to Preferred Towing Service, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Preferred Towing Service, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Preferred Towing Service, LLC against Defendant Daisy Garcia on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Preferred Towing Service, LLC on 07/06/2022 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $185.00 for a total of $5,185.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCorrespondence Brief in Support of Small Claim; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Preferred Towing Service, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Daisy Garcia (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/15/22; Service Cost: 110.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Preferred Towing Service, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Daisy Garcia (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Marcelo D'Asero in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less