Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2021 at 07:30:56 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS YESENIA ROBLES

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YESENIA ROBLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9721

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

ROBLES YESENIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUIZA KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

5/20/2021: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to CIV. Code Sec 1788.60(b)

5/20/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to CIV. Code Sec 1788.60(b)

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

5/25/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

3/15/2021: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Yesenia Robles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC against Defendant Yesenia Robles on the Complaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC on 03/15/2021 for damages of $2,394.36 and costs of $248.00 for a total of $2,642.36.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Yesenia Robles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to CIV. Code Sec 1788.60(b); Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Yesenia Robles; On the Complaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC on 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Yesenia Robles (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/31/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Yesenia Robles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Yesenia Robles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Yesenia Robles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Yesenia Robles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUIZA KEVIN