This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2022 at 14:37:49 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS DAVID MORENO

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAVID MORENO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2645

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

MORENO DAVID

San Gabriel, CA 91775-2841

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKERHOFF KRISTEN LEIGH

Defendant Attorney

GABRA NOHA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/13/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/13/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

11/12/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

11/12/2021: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/15/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

4/15/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID MORENO (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC on 09/13/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); DAVID MORENO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/15/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: DAVID MORENO (Defendant); As to: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 09/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID MORENO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/28/2021; Service Cost: 58.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID MORENO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID MORENO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID MORENO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABRA NOHA