This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2022 at 20:30:16 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS DANIEL MACIAS

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DANIEL MACIAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8966

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

MACIAS DANIEL

South El Monte, CA 91733

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIERCE EMILY DEHAAS

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/11/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/11/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/11/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

8/19/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2023
  • Hearing08/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL MACIAS (Defendant); Service Date: 08/19/2022; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL MACIAS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL MACIAS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL MACIAS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Pierce