Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2021 at 20:09:47 (UTC).

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY VS TRI-SIGNAL INTEGRATION INC.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRI-SIGNAL INTEGRATION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2973

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

TRI-SIGNAL INTEGRATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLEASANT JOSEPH M

 

Court Documents

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

5/11/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/14/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration declaration of venue

4/14/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration declaration of venue

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/14/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/14/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2024
  • Hearing04/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Tri-Signal Integration Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Tri-Signal Integration Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Tri-Signal Integration Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration declaration of venue; Filed by: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Tri-Signal Integration Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Tri-Signal Integration Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRI-SIGNAL INTEGRATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARLAN M. REESE & ASSOCIATES - JOSEPH M. PLEASANT