Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 17:47:32 (UTC).

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY VS SBB ROOFING INC

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SBB ROOFING INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2972

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SBB ROOFING INC DBA BILT-WELL ROOF & MATERIAL CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLEASANT JOSEPH M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/14/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/14/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/14/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

4/14/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2024
  • Hearing04/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SBB ROOFING INC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/12/2021; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SBB ROOFING INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SBB ROOFING INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SBB ROOFING INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VENUE; Filed by: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SBB ROOFING INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SBB ROOFING INC. AKA BILT WELL ROOF AND MATERIAL CO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARLAN M. REESE & ASSOCIATES - JOSEPH M. PLEASANT