This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2022 at 15:14:35 (UTC).

PHAT TAN TRAN VS YUXIONG SHEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 PHAT TAN TRAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YUXIONG SHEN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3397

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAN PHAT TAN

Defendants

SHEN YUXIONG

ZHU HELEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FAIRCHILD DARA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

5/18/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

5/18/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

5/18/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

5/18/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/18/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

6/23/2022: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2025
  • Hearing05/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2023
  • Hearing11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Yuxiong Shen (Defendant); As to: Phat Tan Tran (Plaintiff); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Yuxiong Shen (Defendant); Helen Zhu (Defendant); As to: Phat Tan Tran (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Phat Tan Tran (Plaintiff); As to: Yuxiong Shen (Defendant); Service Date: 06/04/2022; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Phat Tan Tran (Plaintiff); As to: Yuxiong Shen (Defendant); Helen Zhu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Phat Tan Tran (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less