This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2022 at 22:51:31 (UTC).

PERRIN BERNARD SUPOWITZ, LLC VS TOTAL BOXES INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 PERRIN BERNARD SUPOWITZ, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOTAL BOXES INC , A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5943

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERRIN BERNARD SUPOWITZ LLC DBA INDIVIDUAL FOODSERVICE

Defendants

TOTAL BOXES INC. A CORPORATION

HWANG AN INDIVIDUAL HING AKA HING KA HWANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERMAN MARLEE

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/11/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

3/11/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/11/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

5/13/2022: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/9/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/9/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/9/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

5/9/2022: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

6/3/2022: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

6/3/2022: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TOTAL BOXES INC., a corporation (Defendant); HING HWANG, an individual (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 2181.53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC DBA Individual Foodservice against Defendant TOTAL BOXES INC., a corporation and Defendant HING HWANG, an individual AKA HING KA HWANG on the Complaint filed by Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC on 03/11/2022 for damages of $1,551.50, attorney fees of $183.00, interest of $73.11, and costs of $373.92 for a total of $2,181.53.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TOTAL BOXES INC., a corporation (Defendant); HING HWANG, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 05/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TOTAL BOXES INC., a corporation (Defendant); HING HWANG, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TOTAL BOXES INC., a corporation (Defendant); HING HWANG, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to TOTAL BOXES INC., a corporation; HING HWANG, an individual; On the Complaint filed by Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC on 03/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HING HWANG, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/24/2022; Service Cost: 71.96; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TOTAL BOXES INC., a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/24/2022; Service Cost: 76.96; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TOTAL BOXES INC., a corporation (Defendant); HING HWANG, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TOTAL BOXES INC., a corporation (Defendant); HING HWANG, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TOTAL BOXES INC., a corporation (Defendant); HING HWANG, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less