This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 09:02:15 (UTC).

PERRIN BERNARD SUPOWITZ, LLC VS AL WAZIR CHICKEN, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 PERRIN BERNARD SUPOWITZ, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AL WAZIR CHICKEN, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9293

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERRIN BERNARD SUPOWITZ LLC DBA INDIVIDUAL FOODSERVICE

Defendant

AL WAZIR CHICKEN INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERMAN MARLEE

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/6/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/6/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/6/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/21/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

10/25/2022: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

10/25/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/25/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/25/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Judgment - Judgment

12/12/2022: Judgment - Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

1/3/2023: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

1/3/2023: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Al Wazir Chicken, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC DBA Individual Foodservice against Defendant Al Wazir Chicken, Inc., a corporation on the Complaint filed by Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC on 09/06/2022 for damages of $9,539.61, attorney fees of $662.37, interest of $590.67, and costs of $301.05 for a total of $11,093.70.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Al Wazir Chicken, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Filed By: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Al Wazir Chicken, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Al Wazir Chicken, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Al Wazir Chicken, Inc., a corporation; On the Complaint filed by Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC on 09/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Al Wazir Chicken, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/14/2022; Service Cost: 76.05; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Al Wazir Chicken, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Al Wazir Chicken, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Al Wazir Chicken, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less