This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 11:03:57 (UTC).

PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION VS HAMBONE GROUP INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HAMBONE GROUP INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1037

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP INC. A CORPORATION

Defendant

HAMBONE GROUP INC. A CORPORATION DBA H.H. COTTON'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERMAN MARLEE E.

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/29/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/29/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/29/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/19/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2024
  • Hearing01/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Performance Food Group, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Hambone Group Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/12/2023; Service Cost: 127.16; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Performance Food Group, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Hambone Group Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Performance Food Group, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Hambone Group Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Performance Food Group, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Hambone Group Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less