This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2021 at 20:15:01 (UTC).

PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS LORI GIORGIO

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LORI GIORGIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4446

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA PRC

Defendant

GIORGIO LORI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHILLER MICHAEL I.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

6/11/2021: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/11/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons First Amended

7/28/2021: Summons - Summons First Amended

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

7/27/2021: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/22/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2024
  • Hearing06/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • Hearing12/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSummons First Amended; Issued and Filed by: PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS, INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LORI GIORGIO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS, INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LORI GIORGIO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketAddress for Michael I. Schiller (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS, INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Michael I. Schiller (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS, INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LORI GIORGIO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC. DBA PRC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHILLER MICHAEL I. ATTORNEY AT LAW