This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2023 at 03:33:07 (UTC).

PEARL ROBINSON VS YUMI BRANDS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 PEARL ROBINSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YUMI BRANDS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0903

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBINSON PEARL

Defendants

YUMI BRANDS INC. DBA KFC

SOLORIO JOSEFINA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

11/2/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/2/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

11/2/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/9/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/2/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/22/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

12/22/2022: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/28/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/17/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/17/2023

1/17/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/17/2023

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

1/17/2023: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/17/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Yumi Brands, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Pearl Robinson on 11/02/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/17/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 updated: Result Date to 01/17/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Pearl Robinson (Plaintiff); As to: Yumi Brands, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 12/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 updated: Result Date to 12/22/2022; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Pearl Robinson (Plaintiff); As to: Yumi Brands, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Pearl Robinson (Plaintiff); As to: Yumi Brands, Inc. (Defendant); Josefina Solorio (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Pearl Robinson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Pearl Robinson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Marcelo D'Asero in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KFC CORPORATION is a litigant