This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2023 at 15:11:58 (UTC).

PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC VS RAIHAN QUADERI

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAIHAN QUADERI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7980

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PCA ACQUISITIONS V LLC

Defendant

QUADERI RAIHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AFZALNIA AFSANEH

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

12/15/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/15/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Re: Venue

12/15/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Re: Venue

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/15/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service

1/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2023
  • Hearing12/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service; Filed by: PCA Acquisitions V, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PCA Acquisitions V, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Raihan Quaderi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration Re: Venue; Filed by: PCA Acquisitions V, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Raihan Quaderi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PCA Acquisitions V, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Raihan Quaderi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PCA Acquisitions V, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Raihan Quaderi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less