This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 07:57:34 (UTC).

PATRIOT CEMENT SERVICES, LLC. VS NADY YEE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 PATRIOT CEMENT SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NADY YEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3230

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRIOT CEMENT SERVICES LLC.

Defendants

YEE NADY

19041 PRT LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARGAS BRENDA ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

4/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/26/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2024
  • Hearing04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Patriot Cement Services, LLC. (Plaintiff); As to: Nady Yee (Defendant); 19041 PRT, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Patriot Cement Services, LLC. (Plaintiff); As to: Nady Yee (Defendant); 19041 PRT, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Patriot Cement Services, LLC. (Plaintiff); As to: Nady Yee (Defendant); 19041 PRT, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARGAS BRENDA ELIZABETH