This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2022 at 17:28:20 (UTC).

PATRICK STEPHEN WOOD VS OZH HOLDING 1 LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 PATRICK STEPHEN WOOD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OZH HOLDING 1 LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2702

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOOD PATRICK STEPHEN

Defendants

GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OZH HOLDING 1 LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KELLENER JOSEPH WIND

KELLENER JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

BADKAR DINESH

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/6/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/6/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/6/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension

6/1/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

8/24/2021: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

Answer - Answer

10/12/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

12/20/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

12/20/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/20/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/30/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Patrick Stephen Wood on 08/24/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Patrick Stephen Wood as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Status Date changed from 12/20/2021 to 12/20/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/30/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Patrick Stephen Wood (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: OZH Holding 1 LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Greystar Management (Defendant); As to: Patrick Stephen Wood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Patrick Stephen Wood (Plaintiff); As to: OZH Holding 1 LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 09/14/2021; Service Cost: 110.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Patrick Stephen Wood (Plaintiff); As to: OZH Holding 1 LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by: OZH Holding 1 LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Patrick Stephen Wood (Plaintiff); As to: OZH Holding 1 LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Greystar Management, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Patrick Stephen Wood (Plaintiff); As to: OZH Holding 1 LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Greystar Management, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Patrick Stephen Wood (Plaintiff); As to: OZH Holding 1 LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Greystar Management, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES LP AS MANAGER FOR JTB APTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLENER JOSEPH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLENER JOSEPH WIND