This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 14:37:57 (UTC).

PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC, ET AL. VS PACVIA HOLDINGS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PACVIA HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2580

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PASADENA HOLDINGS LLC

SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES LP

Defendants

PU TI

PU SHU LIN

PACVIA HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZKOLNIK FRED M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2024
  • Hearing04/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • Hearing09/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff); SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Gloria French in Support of Monetary Judgment; Filed by: PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff); SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by: PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff); SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration second part of Gloria French exhibits to Monetary Judgment; Filed by: PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff); SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff); SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LP (Plaintiff); As to: PACVIA HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); SHU LIN PU (Defendant); TI PU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC, et al. on 04/01/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC and SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LP, does 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff); SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LP (Plaintiff); As to: PACVIA HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff); SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LP (Plaintiff); As to: PACVIA HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 07/27/2021; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff); SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LP (Plaintiff); As to: PACVIA HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 07/27/2021; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff); SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LP (Plaintiff); As to: TI PU (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/27/2021; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff); SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LP (Plaintiff); As to: PACVIA HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); SHU LIN PU (Defendant); TI PU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff); SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LP (Plaintiff); As to: PACVIA HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); SHU LIN PU (Defendant); TI PU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PASADENA HOLDINGS, LLC (Plaintiff); SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LP (Plaintiff); As to: PACVIA HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); SHU LIN PU (Defendant); TI PU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHERMAN OAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZKOLNIK FRED M.