This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 19:41:05 (UTC).

PAMELA PERRY VS IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 PAMELA PERRY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3025

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERRY PAMELA

Defendants

IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE

IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

8/18/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/18/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

8/18/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

8/18/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

8/18/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

8/18/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/13/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • Hearing12/08/2021 at 01:30 PM in Department 1A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 12/08/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from In-House Auto Finance (Defendant) to In-House Auto Finance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Pamela Perry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Pamela Perry (Plaintiff); As to: In-House Auto Finance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docket** Case Name changed from PAMELA PERRY vs IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE to PAMELA PERRY vs IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Pamela Perry (Plaintiff); As to: In-House Auto Finance Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Pamela Perry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE INC. is a litigant