This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2023 at 02:39:56 (UTC).

PAHLO PEACOCK VS DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION PARKING

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 PAHLO PEACOCK filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against DEPT OF TRANSPORTATION PARKING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0220

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

PEACOCK PAHLO

DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION PARKING

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

1/12/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

1/12/2023: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

1/12/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision - Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision

1/12/2023: Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision - Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision

Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking

1/12/2023: Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking

Proof of Personal Service - Proof Of Service Notice Of Appeal - Administrative Hearing

1/12/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof Of Service Notice Of Appeal - Administrative Hearing

Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File

1/13/2023: Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File

Notice of Appeal - Notice of Appeal

1/13/2023: Notice of Appeal - Notice of Appeal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal)

4/21/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal)

Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal

4/21/2023: Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Parking Appeal) of 04/21/2023

4/21/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Parking Appeal) of 04/21/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Parking Appeal) of 04/21/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketHearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 04/21/2023 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 04/21/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketRequest for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketHearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 04/21/2023 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Appeal - Parking - Citation Number: 4555492266; Filed by: Pahlo Peacock (Appellant); As to: Dept. of Transportation Parking (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Pahlo Peacock (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketProof Of Service Notice Of Appeal - Administrative Hearing; Filed by: Pahlo Peacock (Appellant); As to: Dept. of Transportation Parking (Respondent); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less