This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2022 at 20:56:07 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC VS JOI W DWIGHT

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOI W DWIGHT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6179

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

DWIGHT JOI W

Carson, CA 90745

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD ROBERT SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

GABRA NOHA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

9/29/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/29/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/18/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

11/3/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • Hearing10/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Joi W Dwight (Defendant); As to: Onemain Financial Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 10/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Joi W Dwight (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/18/2021; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Joi W Dwight (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Joi W Dwight (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Onemain Financial Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Joi W Dwight (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABRA NOHA