This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2022 at 21:32:47 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC VS JEANNETTE PELAYO

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEANNETTE PELAYO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7516

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

PELAYO JEANNETTE

Los Angeles, CA 90042

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/11/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

8/11/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/11/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2023
  • Hearing08/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JEANNETTE PELAYO (Defendant); Service Date: 08/20/2022; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JEANNETTE PELAYO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JEANNETTE PELAYO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JEANNETTE PELAYO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard